Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Ford Motor Credit Company Llc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Rothman, Keith H, against Christine Stratton, in the jurisdiction of Erie County. This case was filed in Erie County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2020 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Non-Card) Transaction |
Last RefreshedOctober 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationErie County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: December 31, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 11, 2021 | JUDGMENT entered in the office of the County Clerk on June 11, 2021 | ||
May 05, 2021 |
JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) JUDGMENT R&R FILE # 1372655 |
||
May 05, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 CERTIFICATE OF CONFORMITY R&R FILE # 1372655 |
||
May 05, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION NON-MILITARY AFFIRMATION R&R FILE # 1372655 |
||
May 05, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT OF MERIT R&R FILE # 1372655 | ||
February 10, 2021 | COURT NOTICE | ||
January 27, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
January 27, 2021 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
December 31, 2020 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.