Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Gary Leskiw, Nina Leskiw, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Moore, William Patrick, against Grandsam Island, Llc, Mcsam Hotel Group, Llc, Mcsam Hotel Management Services, Llc, Radisson Hotels International, Inc., Radisson Hotels Management Corporation, (total of 5) See All represented by Philips, Kelly Jean, in the jurisdiction of Erie County. This case was filed in Erie County Superior Courts with Michael Siragusa presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2020 |
CategoryTorts - Other Negligence (Personal Injury) |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationErie County, NY |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
COMPLAINT
Date: December 31, 2020ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING
Date: March 10, 2022ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING
Date: June 09, 2021NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY
Date: August 08, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 11, 2021RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: May 10, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 11, 2021ANSWER
Date: May 07, 2021SUMMONS
Date: December 31, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 11, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 11, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 11, 2021STIPULATION - PARTIAL DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: March 10, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 08, 2022 | NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY | ||
March 10, 2022 |
ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING Second Amended Case Scheduling Order |
||
March 10, 2022 | STIPULATION - PARTIAL DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | ||
June 09, 2021 | ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING | ||
May 10, 2021 | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
May 07, 2021 | ANSWER | ||
January 11, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service on McSam Hotel Group |
||
January 11, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service on Grandsam Island, LLC |
||
January 11, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service on McSam Hotel Services Management |
||
January 11, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service on Radisson Hotels International |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.