Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
In The Matter Of The Claim Of Kevin Cummings, As Fng Of C.C., An Infant, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Dragonette, Zachary Steven, Foley, Stephen R., against Andrew Dewolf, Tamesha Dewolf, represented by Murray, Matthew Thomas, in the jurisdiction of Erie County. This case was filed in Erie County Superior Courts with Paula L Feroleto presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePaula L Feroleto Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 14, 2023 |
CategoryTorts - Other (Dog Bite) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 01, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationErie County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
This complaint is filed in the Supreme Court of Erie County, New York. The claimant, Kevin Cummings, is the father and natural guardian of an infant named C.C. On July 29, 2021, C.C. was bitten by a dog owned by the respondents, Andrew DeWolf and Tam...
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: January 05, 2024ORDER - COMPROMISE & SETTLEMENT
Date: December 19, 2023ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: December 15, 2023ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A)
Date: December 14, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: December 14, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: December 14, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F
Date: December 14, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: December 14, 2023RJI -RE: INFANT'S COMPROMISE
Date: December 14, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E
Date: December 14, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: December 14, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: December 14, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: December 14, 2023PETITION
Date: December 14, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 05, 2024 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | ||
December 19, 2023 | ORDER - COMPROMISE & SETTLEMENT | ||
December 15, 2023 | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) | ||
December 14, 2023 | ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A) | ||
December 14, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C photo |
||
December 14, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B photo |
||
December 14, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - F structured settlement proposal |
||
December 14, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A hospital records |
||
December 14, 2023 | RJI -RE: INFANT'S COMPROMISE | ||
December 14, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E medical receipts chart |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.