Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Capital One Bank, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Hughes, Adam Michael, against Kiriyasakthy Vinayagam, in the jurisdiction of Erie County. This case was filed in Erie County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 16, 2020 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationErie County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: December 16, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: December 16, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 18, 2021NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: May 10, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: December 16, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: December 16, 2020COURT NOTICE
Date: January 26, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: January 18, 2021202.27-B MAILING RETURNED UNDELIVERABLE
Date: February 05, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 10, 2022 | NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) | ||
February 05, 2021 |
202.27-B MAILING RETURNED UNDELIVERABLE Not deliverable as addressed. Unable to forward. |
||
January 26, 2021 | COURT NOTICE | ||
January 18, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
January 18, 2021 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
December 16, 2020 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT | ||
December 16, 2020 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A NOTICE |
||
December 16, 2020 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C CHARGE-OFF |
||
December 16, 2020 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B MILITARY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.