Case Last Refreshed: 1 day ago
Mimma Mallozzi, As Administrator Of The Estate Of N.M., Deceased, And Mimma Mallozzi And Joseph Mallozzi, Individually, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Rubino, Carmine A., against Kaleida Health Oishei Children'S Hospital, Mark A. Kenyon M.D., Simranjit S. Gill D.O., represented by Mattrey, Colleen Katherine, Mcgorry, Mollie Catherine, Roach, Michael James, in the jurisdiction of Erie County. This case was filed in Erie County Superior Courts Supreme with John Barry presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 20, 2018 |
CategoryTorts - Medical, Dental, Or Podiatrist Malpractice |
Last RefreshedMay 04, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationErie County, NY |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
Filing Court HouseSupreme |
This complaint is a legal document filed in the Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Erie. The plaintiffs, M|MMA Mallozzi as Administrator of the Estate of N.M., deceased, and MIMMA Mallozzi and Joseph Mallozzi individually, are suing th...
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 22, 2023ORDER - TRIAL SCHEDULING
Date: February 02, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 21, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #002)
Date: September 19, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 11, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: December 26, 2023ORDER - TRIAL SCHEDULING
Date: December 12, 2023NOTICE OF APPEAL Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 21, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 19, 2023DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: September 20, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: November 15, 2022ORDER - TRIAL SCHEDULING
Date: August 31, 2023DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 20, 2023ORDER - TRIAL SCHEDULING
Date: May 23, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW Â (Motion #002)
Date: October 31, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #002)
Date: October 31, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #002)
Date: August 09, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: October 31, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #002)
Date: August 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #002)
Date: August 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 27, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #002)
Date: August 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #002) Ex. D - Hospital Chart and Emergency Department Log
Date: August 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #002)
Date: August 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 27, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 27, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #002)
Date: August 09, 2022MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION AND IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: August 09, 2022AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #002)
Date: August 09, 2022NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: August 09, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 27, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 27, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 27, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #001) Mimma Mallozzi EBT Transcript 12.9.19
Date: May 27, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 27, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #001) Plts' VBOP to KH and Plts' VBOP to Dr. Gill
Date: May 27, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 27, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 27, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 27, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 27, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 27, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 27, 2022NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY *Corrected*
Date: January 27, 2022PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: October 26, 2018ANSWER (AMENDED)
Date: October 18, 2018NOTICE OF MEDICAL MALPRACTICE
Date: November 13, 2018RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MEDICAL, DENTAL OR PODIATRIC MALPRACTICE
Date: November 13, 2018PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: October 31, 2018ANSWER
Date: October 18, 2018ANSWER
Date: October 17, 2018ANSWER
Date: October 16, 2018PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: October 15, 2018CERTIFICATE OF MERIT
Date: September 21, 2018SUMMONS + COMPLAINT *Corrected*
Date: September 20, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 30, 2024 | SUBPOENA ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ) | ||
April 23, 2024 | SUBPOENA ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ) | ||
March 21, 2024 | SUBPOENA - SO ORDERED | ||
March 05, 2024 | SUBPOENA ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ) | ||
February 02, 2024 |
ORDER - TRIAL SCHEDULING THIRD AMENDED TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER |
||
December 26, 2023 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Lettter to Justice Licata regarding adjournment of pre-trial conference and jury selection dated 12.26.23 |
||
December 12, 2023 |
ORDER - TRIAL SCHEDULING SECOND AMENDED TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER |
||
October 02, 2023 | Hearing |
Commissioner of Jurors JSS: 10/2 & 10/3/2023 12 days of proof Judge: Marshall, Hon. Frederick J. |
|
September 22, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001) Affidavit of Service - Notice of Appeal |
||
September 21, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Decision and Order 9-19-23 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.