Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
New York Central Mutual Fire Insurance Company As Subrogee Of Michele E. Flanagan, filed a(n) General Negligence - Torts case represented by Cercone, Marco, Rupp Baase Pfalzgraf Cunningham Llc, Snyder, Brandon Michael, Withiam-Leitch, Matthew Frank, against Hughesco Of Rochester, Inc., represented by Whittemore, David S., in the jurisdiction of Erie County. This case was filed in Erie County Superior Courts with Michael Siragusa presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 31, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Other (Subro/Negligence) |
Last RefreshedJuly 24, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationErie County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Negligence |
EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 20, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 24, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: July 21, 2022ANSWER
Date: January 20, 2022NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: January 20, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: July 21, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #002)
Date: July 21, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #002)
Date: July 21, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #002)
Date: July 21, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #002)
Date: July 21, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 07, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #002)
Date: July 21, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 14, 2021SUMMONS + COMPLAINT *Corrected*
Date: August 31, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 11, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 11, 2022RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: January 11, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 11, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: January 11, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: January 11, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: January 20, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #002)
Date: July 21, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #002)
Date: July 21, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #002)
Date: July 21, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #002)
Date: July 21, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #002)
Date: July 21, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 21, 2022 | NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
July 21, 2022 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION | ||
July 21, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - J (Motion #002) Ex. J - Second Good Faith Letter |
||
July 21, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - I (Motion #002) Ex. I - Good Faith Letter |
||
July 21, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #002) Ex. E - Affidavit in Response to Motion for Default Judgment |
||
July 21, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion #002) Ex. H - Letters enclosing discovery demands & responses |
||
July 21, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #002) Ex. B - Affidavit of service of Summons & Complaint |
||
July 21, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #002) Ex. A - Summons & Complaint |
||
July 21, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #002) Ex. F - Defdt's enclosure letter to counsel |
||
July 21, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #002) Ex. D - Motion for Default Judgment |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.