Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Christopher Beckage, Jennifer Beckage, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Bottar, Michael A., against Anthony M. Foti , M.D., Bartels, Powalski & Weissman, M.D.'S, P.C. D B A Empire Obgyn, Edward K. Bartels , M.D., Great Lakes Medical Imaging, L.L.C., Kaleida Health, (total of 11) See All represented by Gruber, John Mark, Kochanowski, Stacy Lee, Sweet, Kathleen Marie, Weidner, Brian James, in the jurisdiction of Erie County. This case was filed in Erie County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 20, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Medical, Dental, Or Podiatrist Malpractice |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationErie County, NY |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: August 20, 2021SUMMONS + COMPLAINT *Corrected*
Date: August 20, 2021ANSWER
Date: October 04, 2021ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: October 15, 2021ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: September 02, 2021ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: September 17, 2021ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: September 17, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 15, 2021 | ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) | ||
October 15, 2021 | NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION | ||
October 15, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
October 04, 2021 | Answer on behalf of Victor S. Regenbogen, M.D. and Great Lakes Medical Imaging, LLC | ||
October 04, 2021 | NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION | ||
September 17, 2021 |
ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) Answer, Bartels, MD |
||
September 17, 2021 |
ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) Answer, Sinatra, MD |
||
September 17, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS - Bartels Powalski & Weissman, MD's PC dba Empire OBGYN |
||
September 17, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS - Edward Bartels, MD |
||
September 17, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS - Limestone Primary Care Physicians, LLP dba Limestone Primary Care |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.