Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
State Of New York Mortgage Agency, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Incorvaia, Christina Alicia, against John Doe #1 Through #6, And Jane Doe #1 Through #6, The Last Twelve Names Being Fictitious, It Being The Intention Of Plaintiff To Designate Any And All Occupants, Tenants, Persons Or Corporations, If Any, Having Or Claiming An Interest In Or Lien Upon The Premises Being Foreclosed Herein, Kim Bennett, Stephen J. Scarfone D B A Surety Remodeling Group, The Estate Of Marjorie L. Davey, in the jurisdiction of Erie County. This case was filed in Erie County Superior Courts with Dennis E. Ward presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 17, 2022 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedJuly 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationErie County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: August 17, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: August 17, 2022COURT NOTICE
Date: September 14, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 31, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2
Date: August 17, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5
Date: August 17, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 23, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 31, 2022PETITION (AMENDED)
Date: September 06, 2022JUDGMENT -TO COURT (PROPOSED)
Date: September 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 8
Date: August 17, 2022ORDER - MOTION - LONG FORM
Date: October 07, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 23, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 23, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 23, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 23, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 23, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 23, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: September 23, 2022RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: September 29, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 29, 2022ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A)
Date: September 29, 2022ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F)
Date: September 29, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 07, 2022 |
ORDER - MOTION - LONG FORM LOAN MODIFICATION |
||
September 30, 2022 |
JUDGMENT -TO COURT (PROPOSED) Order Approving Transfer of Structured Settlement Payment Rights |
||
September 29, 2022 | RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE | ||
September 29, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
September 29, 2022 | ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A) | ||
September 29, 2022 | ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F) | ||
September 23, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Certified Mailing Affidavit United States of America (Western District) |
||
September 23, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS County of Erie |
||
September 23, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS Antonetta Kowalewski |
||
September 23, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS New York State Department of Taxation and Finance |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.