Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
David M. Smith, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Lana, Christina Maria, against Pamela M. Smith, represented by Schulefand, Keith Brian, in the jurisdiction of Erie County. This case was filed in Erie County Superior Courts with Kelly Vacco presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 27, 2020 |
CategoryMatrimonial - Contested |
Last RefreshedJune 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationErie County, NY |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 05, 2023 | ORDER - TRANSFER | ||
August 10, 2021 | PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE NOTICE | ||
August 05, 2021 | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
August 05, 2021 | INFORMATIONAL STATEMENT | ||
May 04, 2021 | RETAINER AGREEMENT | ||
May 04, 2021 | STATEMENT OF NET WORTH | ||
March 26, 2021 | RETAINER AGREEMENT | ||
March 26, 2021 | EXHIBIT(S) | ||
March 26, 2021 | STATEMENT OF NET WORTH | ||
October 22, 2020 | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.