Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Danielle Thomas As Mother And Natural Guardian Of An Infant, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Shemik, Nicholas James, against The City Of Buffalo, represented by Lee, David Michael, in the jurisdiction of Erie County. This case was filed in Erie County Superior Courts with Catherine Nugent Panepint presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 27, 2020 |
CategoryTorts - Other Negligence (Premise Liability) |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationErie County, NY |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: August 27, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 12, 2021NOTICE OF PETITION Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 12, 2021STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: June 23, 2021ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 12, 2021RJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION
Date: January 12, 2021ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (PROPOSED) (AMENDED)
Date: January 21, 2021ORDER (PROPOSED) (AMENDED)
Date: January 21, 2021ORDER - COMPROMISE & SETTLEMENT
Date: January 25, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001) medical records
Date: January 12, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 02, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 23, 2021 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | ||
January 25, 2021 | ORDER - COMPROMISE & SETTLEMENT | ||
January 21, 2021 | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (PROPOSED) (AMENDED) | ||
January 21, 2021 |
ORDER (PROPOSED) (AMENDED) AMENDED ORDER |
||
January 20, 2021 | Hearing |
Granted (Motion #001) Part 3 Judge: Nugent Panepinto, Hon. Catherine R. |
|
January 12, 2021 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #001) Affirmation in Support of Infant Settlement |
||
January 12, 2021 |
NOTICE OF PETITION (Motion #001) Notice of Petition |
||
January 12, 2021 |
ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #001) Proposed Order |
||
January 12, 2021 | RJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION | ||
January 12, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) medical records medical records Possible SSN Administratively Redacted |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.