Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Monica Karsay, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Zaccagnino, Leonard D., against Ciminelli Real Estate Corporation, Sweethome Commerce Park Associates, Llc, represented by Apter, Julie Pasquariello, in the jurisdiction of Erie County. This case was filed in Erie County Superior Courts with Mark A Montour presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 27, 2020 |
CategoryTorts - Other Negligence (Premises) |
Last RefreshedNovember 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationErie County, NY |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: August 27, 2020ANSWER
Date: September 16, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 02, 2020STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: January 10, 2022RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: September 29, 2021BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: October 28, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 10, 2022 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | ||
September 29, 2021 | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
October 28, 2020 | BILL OF PARTICULARS | ||
September 16, 2020 | ANSWER | ||
September 02, 2020 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
August 27, 2020 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.