Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Steven Stern, filed a(n) Assessment Challenge - Tax case represented by Weinmann, Peter Allen, against Town Of Amherst, represented by Seibold, Maura Clare, in the jurisdiction of Erie County. This case was filed in Erie County Superior Courts Erie County Supreme Court with Sharon Townsend presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSharon Townsend Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJuly 21, 2015 |
CategoryTax Certiorari |
|
Last RefreshedJanuary 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaTax |
|
Filing LocationErie County, NY |
Matter TypeAssessment Challenge |
|
Filing Court HouseErie County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time629 days |
ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: April 04, 2017RJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION
Date: July 21, 2015PETITION
Date: July 21, 2015NOTICE OF PETITION ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (Motion #1)
Date: July 21, 2015ORDER - FINAL (Motion #1)
Date: April 10, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 10, 2017 | Motion |
Tax Assessment Review (Motion #001) Decided: 04/10/2017Withdrawn Before Justice: Townsend, Hon. Sharon S. Answer demanded: No Judge: Townsend, Hon. Sharon S. |
|
April 10, 2017 | Hearing |
Settled - Other Part 11 Judge: Townsend, Hon. Sharon S. |
|
April 10, 2017 | Docket Event |
ORDER - FINAL (Motion #1) Consent Order |
|
April 04, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) | |
March 29, 2017 | Hearing |
Motion Filed (Motion #001) Part 11 Judge: Townsend, Hon. Sharon S. |
|
March 29, 2017 | Hearing |
Held Part 11 Judge: Townsend, Hon. Sharon S. |
|
March 15, 2017 | Hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #001) Part 11 Judge: Townsend, Hon. Sharon S. |
|
March 15, 2017 | Hearing |
Held Part 11 Judge: Townsend, Hon. Sharon S. |
|
February 23, 2017 | Hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #001) Part 11 Judge: Townsend, Hon. Sharon S. |
|
February 23, 2017 | Hearing |
Held Part 11 Judge: Townsend, Hon. Sharon S. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.