Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Aramis Rios, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by D'Amato, Christopher Dominic, against Jesse Wright, represented by Shannon, Richard A., in the jurisdiction of Erie County. This case was filed in Erie County Superior Courts Erie County Supreme Court with Paul B. Wojtaszek presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePaul B. Wojtaszek Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 18, 2019 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationErie County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseErie County Supreme Court |
ANSWER
Date: November 26, 2019SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: July 18, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 27, 2020 | Hearing |
Held
Judge: Wojtaszek, Hon. Paul |
|
July 29, 2020 | Docket Event | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | |
November 26, 2019 | Docket Event | ANSWER | |
July 29, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
July 18, 2019 | Docket Event | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.