Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Kera M Chilcott, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Fromen, John J., Grillo, Thomas Joseph, against Annie Y Yu, Yuejin E Yu, represented by Trueman, Alice A, Webb, Brian Mcdonald, in the jurisdiction of Erie County. This case was filed in Erie County Superior Courts with Paula L Feroleto presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePaula L Feroleto Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 05, 2023 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedFebruary 01, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationErie County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
This complaint was filed in the Supreme Court of Erie County, New York. The plaintiff, Kera M. Chilcott, is suing the defendants, Annie Y. Yu and Yuejin E. Yu. The complaint alleges that on July 6, 2020, the plaintiff was operating her motor vehicle ...
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 23, 2023RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: October 25, 2023ANSWER
Date: October 12, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: July 05, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 25, 2023 | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
October 12, 2023 | ANSWER | ||
August 23, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
July 05, 2023 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.