Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
David Phillips, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Walsh, Theresa M, against Buffalo Heart Group, Llp, Richard Jennings Md, represented by Adymy, Elizabeth G., Broad, Sally Jo, Jaehn, Alexandra C., Rossi, Amanda Carmella, in the jurisdiction of Erie County, NY, . Erie County, NY Superior Courts Erie County Supreme Court with Frederick J Marshall presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFrederick J Marshall Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJuly 02, 2015 |
CategoryTort |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions456 days |
Filing LocationErie County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Filing Court HouseErie County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time1678 days |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: February 04, 2020ANSWER
Date: November 18, 2015NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #002)
Date: August 02, 2016AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #003)
Date: November 04, 2016NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: February 17, 2016AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #001)
Date: February 17, 2016NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #003)
Date: November 04, 2016AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #002)
Date: September 15, 2016SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: July 02, 2015NOTICE OF APPEAL
Date: October 31, 2016NOTICE OF MOTION (AMENDED) (Motion #001)
Date: February 17, 2016AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #005)
Date: December 20, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #005)
Date: December 20, 2019NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #005)
Date: December 20, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #004)
Date: March 26, 2019NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #004)
Date: March 26, 2019RECORD ON APPEAL (COPY)
Date: May 23, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #003)
Date: December 30, 2016AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #003)
Date: December 21, 2016ORDER - DISMISSAL (Motion #002)
Date: September 30, 2016AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #002)
Date: September 13, 2016RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: February 17, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 04, 2020 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | |
February 04, 2020 | Hearing |
Withdrawn (Motion #005) Part 5 Judge: Marshall, Hon. Frederick J. |
|
January 28, 2020 | Hearing |
Discontinued Per Amy Z Judge: Marshall, Hon. Frederick J. |
|
January 21, 2020 | Hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #005) Part 5 Judge: Marshall, Hon. Frederick J. |
|
January 03, 2020 | Hearing |
Rescheduled
Judge: Marshall, Hon. Frederick J. |
|
December 24, 2019 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #005) *Corrected* Affidavit of Service |
|
December 20, 2019 | Motion |
Judgment - Summary (Motion #005) Decided: 01/28/2020Withdrawn Before Justice: Marshall, Hon. Frederick J. Answer demanded: Yes Judge: Marshall, Hon. Frederick J. |
|
December 20, 2019 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #005) Expert Affidavit |
|
December 20, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - K (Motion #005) Dr. Jennings Deposition Transcript |
|
December 20, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - J (Motion #005) Bay Pines VA Hospital Medical Records |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.