Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Midfirst Bank, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Falasco, Todd C, Femminella, Nicole P, against Dejean Ingram, John Doe #1 Through John Doe #10 The Last Ten Names Being Fictitious And Unknown To The Plaintiff, The Person Or Parties Intended Being The Persons Or Parties, If Any, Having Or Claiming An Interest In Or Lien Upon The Mortgaged Premises Described In The Complaint, Secretary Of Housing And Urban Development, Tony Rudolph, represented by Cerrone, Michael Salvatore, in the jurisdiction of Erie County, NY, . Erie County, NY Superior Courts Erie County Supreme Court with Paula L Feroleto presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePaula L Feroleto Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJuly 02, 2015 |
CategoryForeclosure (Residential Mortgage) |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions686 days |
Filing LocationErie County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
|
Filing Court HouseErie County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time686 days |
ORDER - REFERENCE
Date: April 04, 2016ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #006)
Date: April 20, 2018ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #003)
Date: April 20, 2017NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #007)
Date: May 31, 2018ORDER - APPOINTING REFEREE (Motion #006)
Date: May 03, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #004)
Date: December 15, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #005)
Date: February 21, 2018NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #005)
Date: February 21, 2018ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #005)
Date: February 21, 2018NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #004)
Date: December 15, 2017ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #007)
Date: May 31, 2018NOTICE OF MOTION (AMENDED) (Motion #007)
Date: May 31, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #006)
Date: April 20, 2018ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #004)
Date: December 15, 2017NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #006)
Date: April 20, 2018LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: July 06, 2017JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE (Motion #003)
Date: May 18, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #007)
Date: May 31, 2018NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #002)
Date: December 13, 2016ORDER - APPOINTING REFEREE (Motion #005)
Date: March 21, 2018ORDER - DISCONTINUING ACTION AND CANCELING NOTICE OF PENDENCY (Motion #007)
Date: June 19, 2018STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: July 31, 2015ORDER - MOTION - LONG FORM (Motion #004)
Date: January 31, 2018ORDER - APPOINTING REFEREE
Date: January 17, 2017STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: July 22, 2015STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: July 25, 2015RJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION
Date: September 17, 2015NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #003)
Date: April 20, 2017STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: July 27, 2015ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #002)
Date: December 13, 2016EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED)
Date: September 17, 2015SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: July 02, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 19, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER - DISCONTINUING ACTION AND CANCELING NOTICE OF PENDENCY (Motion #007) | |
June 13, 2018 | Hearing |
Granted (Motion #007) Part 1 Judge: Feroleto, Hon. Paula L. |
|
May 31, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #007) | |
May 31, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #007) | |
May 31, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MOTION (AMENDED) (Motion #007) | |
May 31, 2018 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #007) | |
May 31, 2018 | Motion |
Cancel/Extend Lis Pendens (Motion #007) Decided: 06/13/2018Granted Before Justice: Feroleto, Hon. Paula L. Answer demanded: No Judge: Feroleto, Hon. Paula L. |
|
May 31, 2018 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #007) | |
May 31, 2018 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #007) Notice of Appearance |
|
May 31, 2018 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #007) Substitute Referee Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.