Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
M&T Bank, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Biryla, Richard John, Hibbert, Seth Lawrence, against Finest Security Service, Inc., Vincent J. Neville A K A Vincent Neville, in the jurisdiction of Erie County, NY, . Erie County, NY Superior Courts Erie County Supreme Court with John Michalski presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJohn Michalski Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJuly 02, 2015 |
CategoryCommercial |
|
Last RefreshedJanuary 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions141 days |
Filing LocationErie County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
|
Filing Court HouseErie County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time141 days |
EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) (Motion #001)
Date: November 10, 2015ORDER - MOTION - LONG FORM (Motion #001)
Date: November 17, 2015SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: July 02, 2015JUDGMENT
Date: November 20, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 20, 2015 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT entered in the office of the County Clerk on November 20, 2015 | |
November 20, 2015 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED) per order granted |
|
November 17, 2015 | Docket Event | ORDER - MOTION - LONG FORM (Motion #001) | |
November 17, 2015 | Motion |
Attorney - Fees (Motion #001) Decided: 11/17/2015Decided Before Justice: Michalski, Hon. John L. Answer demanded: No Judge: Michalski, Hon. John L. |
|
November 17, 2015 | Hearing |
Fully Submitted - No Opposition (Motion #001) Part 18 Judge: Michalski, Hon. John L. |
|
November 10, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) (Motion #001) attorney fee approval |
|
November 10, 2015 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION OF ATTORNEY FEES (Motion #001) affirmation for atty fees |
|
November 03, 2015 | Docket Event |
RJI -RE: OTHER(SPECIFY IN DESCRIPTION AREA) atty fee approval |
|
September 23, 2015 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE affirmation finest |
|
September 23, 2015 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE affidavit finest |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.