Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Good Neighbors Credit Union, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Drexler, Mark Andrew, against Darrius Outling Aka Darius R. Outling, in the jurisdiction of Erie County. This case was filed in Erie County Superior Courts with Gerald J Greenan presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 22, 2023 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedJanuary 29, 2024 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationErie County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
AFFIDAVIT
Date: July 10, 2023EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED)
Date: August 02, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: June 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: June 22, 2023RJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION
Date: August 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: June 22, 2023AFFIRMATION
Date: August 02, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: June 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 02, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 21, 2023 | AFFIRMATION | ||
August 21, 2023 | JUDGMENT entered in the office of the County Clerk on August 21, 2023 | ||
August 21, 2023 | JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED) | ||
August 18, 2023 | ORDER - MOTION - LONG FORM | ||
August 09, 2023 | Affidavit of Mailing-Court Notice | ||
August 09, 2023 | COURT NOTICE | ||
August 02, 2023 | EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) | ||
August 02, 2023 | RJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION | ||
August 02, 2023 | AFFIRMATION | ||
August 02, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Summons and Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.