Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Good Neighbors Credit Union, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Drexler, Mark Andrew, against Michael Feustel, in the jurisdiction of Erie County. This case was filed in Erie County Superior Courts with Raymond Walter presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 22, 2023 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedFebruary 01, 2024 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationErie County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
AFFIRMATION
Date: November 03, 2023ORDER - MOTION - LONG FORM
Date: November 02, 2023JUDGMENT
Date: November 06, 2023JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED)
Date: November 03, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: June 22, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: July 10, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: June 22, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: June 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: June 22, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 06, 2023 | JUDGMENT entered in the office of the County Clerk on November 06, 2023 | ||
November 03, 2023 | AFFIRMATION | ||
November 03, 2023 | JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED) | ||
November 02, 2023 | ORDER - MOTION - LONG FORM | ||
September 21, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Affidavit of Merit |
||
September 21, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #001) Affidavit of Mailing |
||
September 21, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) SCRA Military Search |
||
September 21, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Summons and Complaint |
||
September 21, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #001) Affidavit of Service |
||
September 21, 2023 | RJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.