Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
M&T Bank, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Hibbert, Seth Lawrence, against Bernal Solutions Llc, Esther S. Reizes A K A Esther Reizes A K A Esther S. Lowenbein A K A Esther Lowenbein, in the jurisdiction of Erie County. This case was filed in Erie County Superior Courts with Deborah Chimes presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDeborah Chimes Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 14, 2023 |
CategoryCommercial Division |
Last RefreshedFebruary 01, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationErie County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: November 22, 2023AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 22, 2023ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 22, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 29, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 22, 2023ADDENDUM - COMMERCIAL DIVISION (840C)
Date: November 22, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 29, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 22, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 12, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION (AMENDED) Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 12, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #001) Summons & Complaint Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: November 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001) DOD SCRA Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: November 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Demand Letter Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: June 14, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: June 14, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 02, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 02, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 12, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001) Affidavit of Service of Notice of Motion |
||
December 12, 2023 |
NOTICE OF MOTION (AMENDED) (Motion #001) Amended Notice of Motion to reflect return date |
||
November 22, 2023 | RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
November 22, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT (Motion #001) Military Service Affidavit |
||
November 22, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #001) Affidavits of Service |
||
November 22, 2023 |
ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #001) Proposed Order |
||
November 22, 2023 |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) Ex Parte Motion |
||
November 22, 2023 | ADDENDUM - COMMERCIAL DIVISION (840C) | ||
November 22, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001) Affidavit in Support of Entry of Default Judgment and Quantum Meruit Attorneys' Fees and Costs Appli Affidavit in Support of Entry of Default Judgment and Quantum Meruit Attorneys' Fees and Costs Appli ... show more |
||
November 22, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 3 (Motion #001) Affirmations of Mailing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.