Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Buffalo Biodiesel Inc., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Lyons, Thomas David, Missell, Cory James, against 7Th Street Family Restaurant, Llc D B A 7Th Street Family Restaurant, in the jurisdiction of Erie County, NY, . Erie County, NY Superior Courts with Donna Siwek presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 22, 2022 |
CategoryCommercial - Contract |
Last RefreshedNovember 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationErie County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: June 22, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: July 31, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: July 31, 2023ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 10, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 31, 2023ORDER - DEFAULT JUDGMENT
Date: September 18, 2023BILL OF COSTS
Date: August 10, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION (AMENDED) Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 10, 2023RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: July 31, 2023ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A)
Date: July 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 31, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: July 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: June 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E
Date: June 22, 2022SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: June 22, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: June 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: June 22, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 14, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 18, 2023 | ORDER - DEFAULT JUDGMENT | ||
September 05, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
August 10, 2023 | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #001) | ||
August 10, 2023 | BILL OF COSTS | ||
August 10, 2023 | NOTICE OF MOTION (AMENDED) (Motion #001) | ||
July 31, 2023 | NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
July 31, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT | ||
July 31, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) Sum Certain Worksheet |
||
July 31, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) PSN and Mailings |
||
July 31, 2023 | RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.