Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Bennett, Ginger, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Bennett, Robert, in the jurisdiction of Napa County. This case was filed in Napa County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 18, 2006 |
CategoryDissolution W/O Minor Children |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions322 days |
Filing LocationNapa County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time322 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 05, 2007 | Docket Event |
Notice 912910-Notice Filed/Issued By: 912320 - Petitioner Pro Per NOTICE [912910] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By PETITIONER PRO PER [912320] |
|
November 05, 2007 | Docket Event |
Converted Stat Closure Disposition Date: Nov 5 2007 Type: 944110 - Judgment/Order Manner : 941110 - Before Hearing |
|
November 05, 2007 | Docket Event |
Judgment 926110-Judgment Filed/Issued By: 912320 - Petitioner Pro Per JUDGMENT [926110] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By PETITIONER PRO PER [912320] |
|
October 26, 2007 | Docket Event |
Declaration: Default 913320-Declaration: Default Filed/Issued By: 912320 - Petitioner Pro Per DECLARATION: DEFAULT [913320] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By PETITIONER PRO PER [912320] |
|
October 26, 2007 | Docket Event |
Request: Enter Default 929120-Request: Default Filed/Issued By: 912320 - Petitioner Pro Per REQUEST: DEFAULT [929120] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By PETITIONER PRO PER [912320] |
|
January 02, 2007 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service 912310-Proof of Service Filed/Issued By: 912320 - Petitioner Pro Per PROOF OF SERVICE [912310] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By PETITIONER PRO PER [912320] |
|
December 27, 2006 | Docket Event |
Declaration 913310-Declaration Filed/Issued By: 912320 - Petitioner Pro Per DECLARATION [913310] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By PETITIONER PRO PER [912320] |
|
December 27, 2006 | Docket Event |
Declaration: Income and Expense 933610-Income and Expense Filed/Issued By: 912320 - Petitioner Pro Per INCOME AND EXPENSE [933610] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By PETITIONER PRO PER [912320] |
|
December 27, 2006 | Docket Event |
Stipulation 913510-Stipulation Filed/Issued By: 911320 - Respondent Pro Per STIPULATION [913510] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By RESPONDENT PRO PER [911320] |
|
December 18, 2006 | Docket Event |
Petition 912110-Petition Filed/Issued By: 912320 - Petitioner Pro Per PETITION [912110] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By PETITIONER PRO PER [912320] |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.