Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
M&T Bank, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Biryla, Richard John, Hibbert, Seth Lawrence, against Craig A. Papke A K A Craig Papke, Individually And D B A Craig Papke Agency, Craig A. Papke A K A Craig Papke, Individually And D B A Craig Papke Agency, Erin M. Papke A K A Erin Papke, Erin M. Papke A K A Erin Papke, in the jurisdiction of Erie County. This case was filed in Erie County Superior Courts Erie County Supreme Court with Deborah Chimes presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateApril 05, 2018 |
CategoryCommercial Division |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions160 days |
Filing LocationErie County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
|
Filing Court HouseErie County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time160 days |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 26, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Note No. 1 Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: April 05, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #001) Summons & Complaint Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: June 26, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 26, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 26, 2018JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED)
Date: September 12, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Craig Papke Guaranty No. 1 Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: April 05, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Joint Papke Guaranty Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: April 05, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Erin Papke Guaranty No. 1 Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: April 05, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Demand Letter Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: April 05, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Note No. 2 Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: April 05, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Note No. 3 Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: April 05, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Application Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: April 05, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 24, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Demand Letter Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: April 05, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 24, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 24, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 24, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001) DOD SCRA Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: June 26, 2018AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 26, 2018ADDENDUM - COMMERCIAL DIVISION (840C)
Date: June 26, 2018JUDGMENT
Date: September 12, 2018STIPULATION - VACATE JUDGMENT
Date: September 17, 2018ORDER - MOTION - LONG FORM
Date: September 11, 2018RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: June 26, 2018ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 26, 2018NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 26, 2018SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: April 05, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - VACATE JUDGMENT Stipulation to Vacate Judgment |
|
September 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED) judgment per order granted |
|
September 12, 2018 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT entered in the office of the County Clerk on September 12, 2018 | |
September 11, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER - MOTION - LONG FORM | |
June 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001) Affidavit in Support of Motion for Default Judgment |
|
June 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #001) Summons & Complaint Redacted per 22 NYCRR Summons & Complaint Redacted |
|
June 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #001) Affidavits of Service |
|
June 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 3 (Motion #001) Affirmations of Mailing |
|
June 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) DOD SCRA Redacted per 22 NYCRR DOD SCRA Redacted |
|
June 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT (Motion #001) Military Service Affidavit |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.