Case Last Refreshed: 11 months ago
Town Of Tonawanda, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Goldberg, Ari Micah, Joyce, Paul G., against Citimortgage, Inc., represented by Gallo, David A, in the jurisdiction of Erie County. This case was filed in Erie County Superior Courts Erie County Supreme Court.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 03, 2018 |
CategoryReal Property - Other (Rpapl Violations) |
Last RefreshedJuly 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationErie County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Filing Court HouseErie County Supreme Court |
Case Cycle Time191 days |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT *Corrected*
Date: April 03, 2018ANSWER
Date: July 17, 2018STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: October 11, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: April 03, 2018STIPULATION - SERVICE
Date: July 09, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: April 03, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 30, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) STIPULATION OF DISCONTINUANCE |
|
July 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
ANSWER Verified Answer |
|
July 09, 2018 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - SERVICE | |
April 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint |
|
April 03, 2018 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT *Corrected* Verified |
|
April 03, 2018 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Notice Letter |
|
April 03, 2018 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - B Enforcement Notification |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.