Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Discover Bank, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Slamowitz, Mitchell G, against Janelle M Wilgus, in the jurisdiction of Erie County. This case was filed in Erie County Superior Courts Erie County Supreme Court.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 12, 2017 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationErie County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
Filing Court HouseErie County Supreme Court |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: April 12, 2017JUDGMENT
Date: February 16, 2018STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: May 22, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 16, 2018 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT entered in the office of the County Clerk on February 16, 2018 | |
January 05, 2018 | Docket Event | COURT NOTICE | |
January 02, 2018 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS | |
January 02, 2018 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR | |
January 02, 2018 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | |
January 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - B TERMS |
|
January 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A CLIENT STATEMENTS |
|
January 02, 2018 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT | |
January 02, 2018 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION | |
January 02, 2018 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.