Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
Richard D. Nagel Sr., filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Murrett, John Charles, against John C. Kossow, represented by D'Angelo, Tiffany Lee, in the jurisdiction of Erie County. This case was filed in Erie County Superior Courts Erie County Supreme Court with Christopher Burns presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 10, 2013 |
CategoryTort |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationErie County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Filing Court HouseErie County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time897 days |
COMPLAINT
Date: December 10, 2013ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: April 01, 2016ORDER - MOTION - LONG FORM
Date: April 07, 2016AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 07, 2014AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 03, 2014RJI -RE: OTHER(SPECIFY IN DESCRIPTION AREA)
Date: April 02, 2014EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #002)
Date: November 10, 2015EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #002)
Date: November 10, 2015EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #002)
Date: January 13, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #002)
Date: January 13, 2016BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: July 11, 2014EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: July 11, 2014NOTE OF ISSUE:WITHOUT JURY
Date: September 18, 2015EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #002)
Date: January 13, 2016NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION
Date: April 08, 2014DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL (N.O.I. PREVIOUSLY PAID)
Date: October 01, 2015EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #002)
Date: November 10, 2015EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #002)
Date: November 10, 2015SUMMONS
Date: December 10, 2013EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #002)
Date: November 10, 2015AFFIRMATION
Date: January 13, 2016NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI)
Date: June 09, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #002)
Date: November 10, 2015SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY (POST RJI)
Date: July 15, 2014EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #002)
Date: November 10, 2015EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #002)
Date: November 10, 2015EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #002)
Date: November 10, 2015RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: July 11, 2014AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: January 19, 2016ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: April 02, 2014AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: November 10, 2015DECISION ON MOTION -SUBMIT ORD / JGMT
Date: March 18, 2016DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: April 08, 2014NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION
Date: April 08, 2014ANSWER
Date: April 08, 2014STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: May 25, 2016NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: November 10, 2015MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT
Date: November 10, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 09, 2021 | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI) | ||
May 25, 2016 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) | |
April 25, 2016 | Hearing |
Settled Part 19 Judge: Burns, Hon. Christopher J. |
|
April 07, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER - MOTION - LONG FORM | |
April 07, 2016 | Hearing |
Held Part 19 Judge: Burns, Hon. Christopher J. |
|
April 01, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) | |
March 24, 2016 | Hearing |
Adjourned Part 19 Judge: Burns, Hon. Christopher J. |
|
March 18, 2016 | Docket Event | DECISION ON MOTION -SUBMIT ORD / JGMT | |
January 19, 2016 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION | |
January 14, 2016 | Hearing |
Fully Submitted - No Opposition (Motion #002) Part 19 Judge: Burns, Hon. Christopher J. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.