Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Ievolve, Inc., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Coren, Jeffrey David, Mcnamara, David J., against Gerald E. Hickson, represented by Clack, Richard A., in the jurisdiction of Erie County. This case was filed in Erie County Superior Courts Erie County Supreme Court with Emilio Colaiacovo presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEmilio Colaiacovo Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 18, 2020 |
CategoryCommercial Division |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationErie County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseErie County Supreme Court |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: March 18, 2020ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S)
Date: June 08, 2020REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S)
Date: October 13, 2020ORDER - OTHER
Date: March 02, 2021STIPULATION - CONFIDENTIALITY ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: March 02, 2021ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING
Date: May 28, 2021ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: March 02, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: March 02, 2021ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: May 11, 2023ORDER - MOTION - LONG FORM
Date: July 18, 2023AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #4)
Date: November 30, 2022NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #4)
Date: November 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #4)
Date: November 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #4)
Date: November 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #3)
Date: November 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #4)
Date: November 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #4)
Date: November 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #3)
Date: November 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #3)
Date: November 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #3)
Date: November 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #3)
Date: November 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #3)
Date: November 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #3)
Date: November 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #3)
Date: November 08, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: April 05, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #3)
Date: November 08, 2022ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING
Date: March 14, 2022ORDER - (PROPOSED) "SUBMIT ORDER" PER JUDGES DECISION
Date: April 04, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - T Â (Motion #2)
Date: February 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - N Â (Motion #2)
Date: February 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #2)
Date: February 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - Q Â (Motion #2)
Date: February 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - S Â (Motion #2)
Date: February 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - P Â (Motion #2)
Date: February 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - O Â (Motion #2)
Date: February 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - R Â (Motion #2)
Date: February 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #2)
Date: February 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #2)
Date: February 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #2)
Date: February 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #2)
Date: February 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #2)
Date: February 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #2)
Date: February 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #2)
Date: February 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #2)
Date: February 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #2)
Date: February 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #2)
Date: February 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #2)
Date: February 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #2)
Date: February 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 13, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 13, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION (AMENDED) Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 13, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 13, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 13, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 13, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 13, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 13, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: January 13, 2022ADDENDUM - COMMERCIAL DIVISION (840C)
Date: January 19, 2021RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: January 19, 2021SUMMONS (PRE RJI) (AMENDED)
Date: March 18, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 22, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #3)
Date: May 11, 2023ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING
Date: September 26, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #4)
Date: July 27, 2023NOTICE OF APPEAL Â (Motion #3)
Date: August 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 16
Date: April 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #4)
Date: May 11, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #4)
Date: May 11, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #3)
Date: May 11, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 15 Coren Letter to Clack, dated 12/9/21
Date: April 27, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #3)
Date: July 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 13
Date: April 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 14
Date: April 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 8
Date: April 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 12
Date: April 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 9
Date: April 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7
Date: April 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 11
Date: April 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6
Date: April 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 10
Date: April 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: April 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 11
Date: April 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5
Date: April 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3
Date: April 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #3)
Date: March 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #3)
Date: March 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: April 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #3) Coren Letter to Clack, dated 12/9/21
Date: March 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4
Date: April 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2
Date: April 27, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #3)
Date: March 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #3)
Date: March 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: April 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #3)
Date: February 07, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY Â (Motion #4)
Date: December 20, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #3)
Date: February 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 11 Â (Motion #4)
Date: November 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #4)
Date: November 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 13 Â (Motion #4)
Date: November 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 10 Â (Motion #4)
Date: November 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 12 Â (Motion #4)
Date: November 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 9 Â (Motion #4)
Date: November 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7 Â (Motion #4)
Date: November 30, 2022AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #4) *Corrected*
Date: November 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 8 Â (Motion #4)
Date: November 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #4)
Date: November 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #4)
Date: November 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6 Â (Motion #4)
Date: November 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #4)
Date: November 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #4)
Date: November 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #4) Exhibit 1
Date: November 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #4)
Date: November 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #4)
Date: November 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #4)
Date: November 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #3)
Date: November 08, 2022ORDER - MOTION - LONG FORM Â (Motion #2)
Date: April 05, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #3)
Date: November 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #3)
Date: November 08, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #3)
Date: November 08, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: November 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #3)
Date: November 08, 2022ORDER - MOTION - LONG FORM Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 05, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 26, 2023 | ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING | ||
August 22, 2023 |
NOTICE OF APPEAL (Motion #3) Notice of Appeal re Motions Nos. 3 and 4 |
||
July 27, 2023 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #4) of Hon. Timothy Walker's 7.13.23 Order |
||
July 27, 2023 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #3) of Hon. Timothy Walker's 7.13.23 Order |
||
July 18, 2023 | ORDER - MOTION - LONG FORM | ||
May 11, 2023 | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) | ||
May 11, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #3) 04.27.2023 Hearing Transcript |
||
May 11, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #4) 03.07.2023 Email Decision |
||
May 11, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #4) 04.27.2023 Hearing Transcript |
||
May 11, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #3) 03.07.2023 Email Decision |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.