Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
John P. Meisenburg, Sharon A. Meisenburg, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Laraby, Daniel Paul, Porter, Michael Scott, against Farid Berenji M.D., General Physician, P.C., Thomas F. Hughes Iii M.D., represented by Hiser, Seth Allen, Roach, Michael James, in the jurisdiction of Erie County. This case was filed in Erie County Superior Courts with Frederick J Marshall presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFrederick J Marshall Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 11, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Medical, Dental, Or Podiatrist Malpractice |
Last RefreshedDecember 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationErie County, NY |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
ANSWER
Date: March 09, 2021ANSWER
Date: March 09, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 17, 2021RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: March 16, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 01, 2021STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: October 12, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 22, 2021CERTIFICATE OF MERIT
Date: February 11, 2021ANSWER
Date: March 09, 2021SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: February 11, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 12, 2021 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | ||
April 16, 2021 | Hearing |
Judge: Marshall, Hon. Frederick J. |
|
March 16, 2021 | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
March 09, 2021 |
ANSWER on behalf of General Physician, PC |
||
March 09, 2021 |
ANSWER on behalf of Dr. Berenji |
||
March 09, 2021 |
ANSWER on behalf of Dr. Hughes |
||
March 01, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS for S&C (Thomas F. Hughes, III, M.D.) |
||
February 22, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS for S&C (Farid Berenji, M.D.) |
||
February 17, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS for S&C (General Physician, P.C.) |
||
February 11, 2021 | Certificate of Merit (Summons & Complaint) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.