Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Capital One Bank (Usa), N.A. v. Jennifer A Ostrowski
On March 02, 2018 an other matters - consumer credit (card) original creditor plaintiff case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Erie County. Judge Dennis Ward presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
March 02, 2018
Last Refreshed
July 28, 2023
Filing Location
Erie County, NY
Filing Court House
Erie County Supreme Court
Category
Other Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
Consumer Debt
Case Outcome Type
Disposed
Status
Judgment (Other)
Case Duration
6 months and 16 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
ORDER - VACATING PRIOR DECISION / ORDER (Motion 002)
Date: Jan 07, 2019ORDER - VACATING JUDGMENT (Motion 002)
Date: Nov 29, 2018RJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION (Motion 002) Corrected
Date: Nov 26, 2018EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) (Motion 002)
Date: Oct 24, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion 002)
Date: Oct 24, 2018JUDGMENT
Date: Sep 17, 2018STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: Apr 09, 2018SUMMONS COMPLAINT
Date: Mar 02, 2018Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 07, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER - VACATING PRIOR DECISION / ORDER (Motion #002) | |
January 02, 2019 | hearing |
Granted (Motion #002)
Judge: Ward, Hon. Dennis |
|
December 07, 2018 | Motion |
Vacate - Decision/Order/Judgment/Award (Motion #002) Decided: 01/02/2019Granted Before Justice: Ward, Hon. Dennis Answer demanded: No Judge: Ward, Hon. Dennis |
|
November 29, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER - VACATING JUDGMENT (Motion #002) | |
November 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
RJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION (Motion #002) *Corrected* RJI |
|
October 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) (Motion #002) Order |
|
October 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #002) Affirmation |
|
October 24, 2018 | Motion |
Vacate - Decision/Order/Judgment/Award (Motion #001) Decided: 11/28/2018Granted Answer demanded: No Judge: Decided: 11/28/2018Granted |
|
October 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #002) Exhibit B |
|
October 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #002) Exhibit A |
|
September 17, 2018 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT entered in the office of the County Clerk on September 17, 2018 | |
July 19, 2018 | Docket Event | COURT NOTICE | |
July 03, 2018 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION NON MILITARY AFFIRMATION R&R FILE# 1217393 |
|
July 03, 2018 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS SOL AFFIRMATION R&R FILE# 1217393 |
|
July 03, 2018 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR AFFIDAVIT OF MERIT R&R FILE# 1217393 |
|
July 03, 2018 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) Judgment R&R file#: 1217393 |
|
April 09, 2018 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | |
April 09, 2018 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
March 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons & Complaint R&R file#: 1217393 |