Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Hsbc Bank Usa, National Association, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Sarzynski, Daniel E, against Hyun Chung, New York Endovascular Surgery, P.C., in the jurisdiction of Erie County. This case was filed in Erie County Superior Courts Erie County Supreme Court.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateFebruary 28, 2019 |
CategoryCommercial - Contract |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions105 days |
Filing LocationErie County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseErie County Supreme Court |
Case Cycle Time106 days |
JUDGMENT
Date: June 14, 2019SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: February 28, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 28, 2019 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service of Notice of Entry of Judgment |
|
June 28, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment | |
June 14, 2019 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT entered in the office of the County Clerk on June 14, 2019 | |
June 13, 2019 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) *Corrected* | |
June 11, 2019 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Amended Affidavit of Service - Hyun Chung |
|
May 31, 2019 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Notice of Service and Affidavit Pursuant to CPLR 3215(g) |
|
March 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service - New York Endovascular Surgery, P.C. |
|
March 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service - Hyun Chung |
|
February 28, 2019 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons and Verified Complaint |
|
February 28, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - C Exhibit C - Copy of the Security Agreement |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.