Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
First National Bank Of Omaha A Subsidiary Of First National Of Nebraska, Inc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Stein, Mark H, against Scott D Grant, represented by Francisco-Lau, Erica Maysan, in the jurisdiction of Erie County. This case was filed in Erie County Superior Courts Erie County Supreme Court.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 05, 2019 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationErie County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
Filing Court HouseErie County Supreme Court |
Case Cycle Time118 days |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT *Corrected*
Date: February 12, 2019STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI)
Date: June 03, 2019STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: April 19, 2019ANSWER
Date: April 18, 2019STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: February 05, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 03, 2019 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI) | |
May 16, 2019 | Docket Event | COURT NOTICE | |
April 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Authorization Form |
|
April 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service - Scott D Grant |
|
April 18, 2019 | Docket Event | ANSWER | |
February 12, 2019 | Docket Event | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT *Corrected* | |
February 05, 2019 | Docket Event |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTH FORM |
|
February 05, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A EXHIBIT A |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.