Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Peachtree Settlement Funding, Llc, filed a(n) Special Proceedings - Other (Structured Settlement Pet) case represented by Hamerman, Dina Leah, against Ge Capital Assignment Corporation, Genworth Life Insurance Company Of New York, Joseph Amanti, in the jurisdiction of Erie County. This case was filed in Erie County Superior Courts Erie County Supreme Court with John Michalek presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateFebruary 23, 2016 |
CategorySpecial Proceedings - Other (Structured Settlement Pet) |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 21, 2023 |
||
Filing LocationErie County, NY |
||
Filing Court HouseErie County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time58 days |
PETITION
Date: February 23, 2016AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: February 23, 2016RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: February 23, 2016ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #001)
Date: February 29, 2016ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (PROPOSED) (Motion #001)
Date: February 23, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 21, 2016 | Hearing |
Motion Filed (Motion #001) John Michalek(Motion Part) Judge: Michalek, Hon. John A. |
|
April 18, 2016 | Hearing |
Stipulation Filed John Michalek (Conf) Judge: Michalek, Hon. John A. |
|
April 18, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | |
March 07, 2016 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001) | |
February 29, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #001) | |
February 25, 2016 | Motion |
Transfer - Structured Settlement (Motion #001) Decided: 04/21/2016Withdrawn Before Justice: Michalek, Hon. John A. Answer demanded: No Judge: Michalek, Hon. John A. |
|
February 23, 2016 | Docket Event | PETITION | |
February 23, 2016 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT | |
February 23, 2016 | Docket Event | RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE | |
February 23, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (PROPOSED) (Motion #001) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.