Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
Richard Tartick, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Bacher, Elizabeth Katherine, Coutu, Michael Todd, Rimmler, Anne Beltz, against Jetro Cash And Carry Enterprises, Llc., Jetro Holdings, Llc, Jetro Management & Development Corp., Jmdh Real Estate Of Buffalo, Llc, Restaurant Depot Enterprises, Llc., (total of 6) See All represented by Briandi, Jody Elizabeth, Eyre, Kara Marie, Mccarthy, Anastasia Marie, in the jurisdiction of Erie County. This case was filed in Erie County Superior Courts Erie County Supreme Court with Raymond Walter presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 29, 2019 |
CategoryTorts - Other Negligence (Trip And Fall) |
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationErie County, NY |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
Filing Court HouseErie County Supreme Court |
ANSWER
Date: March 14, 2019SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: January 29, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 30, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 05, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 05, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 05, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 05, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 05, 2019CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (PRE RJI)
Date: March 09, 2020NOTICE OF DEPOSITION
Date: March 14, 2019RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: September 25, 2020NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: September 25, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 30, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 30, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 30, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 30, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 30, 2021ORDER - MOTION - LONG FORM
Date: April 27, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 05, 2019NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 30, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 30, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 30, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 30, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 30, 2021ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: May 03, 2021ORDER - AMENDED
Date: May 04, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #002)
Date: April 11, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #002)
Date: April 11, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #002)
Date: April 11, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #002)
Date: April 11, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #002)
Date: April 11, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #002)
Date: April 11, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #002)
Date: April 11, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: April 25, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #002)
Date: April 11, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #002)
Date: May 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #002)
Date: May 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #002)
Date: May 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #002)
Date: May 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E *Corrected*
Date: April 25, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F
Date: April 25, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - G
Date: April 25, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #002)
Date: April 11, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #002) *Corrected*
Date: April 11, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #002)
Date: April 11, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #002)
Date: April 11, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #002)
Date: April 11, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #002)
Date: May 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #002)
Date: May 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #002)
Date: May 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #002)
Date: May 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: April 25, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B *Corrected*
Date: April 25, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E
Date: April 25, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C *Corrected*
Date: April 25, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #002)
Date: May 24, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #002)
Date: May 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D *Corrected*
Date: April 25, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #002)
Date: May 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #002)
Date: May 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #002)
Date: May 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #002)
Date: May 24, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 24, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #002) EXHIBIT C- Defendants' Original Notice to Produce Responses, dated June 17, 2022 |
||
May 24, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - K (Motion #002) EXHIBIT K- Order in Kayantas v. Restaurant Depot LLC |
||
May 24, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - L (Motion #002) EXHIBIT L- Maurici Article |
||
May 24, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #002) EXHIBIT D- Defendants' Supplemental Notice to Produce Responses, dated August 23, 2022 |
||
May 24, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #002) EXHIBIT E- Plaintiff's Good Faith Letter, dated March 03, 2023 |
||
May 24, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #002) EXHIBIT F- Excerpts from the Deposition of Nicholas Guagenti |
||
May 24, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - M (Motion #002) EXHIBIT M- Investigator Statement of Heather Lewis, dated May 24, 2016 |
||
May 24, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #002) EXHIBIT G- Eleven Photographs Disclosed by Defendants |
||
May 24, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion #002) EXHIBIT H- Order of Judge Eig, dated June 7, 2018 |
||
May 24, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #002) Reply Affirmation in Further Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Strike, dated May 24, 2023 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.