Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
Second Round Sub Llc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Einstein, Stephen, against Rosemary Warner, in the jurisdiction of Erie County. This case was filed in Erie County Superior Courts Erie County Supreme Court.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJanuary 29, 2019 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Debt Buyer Plaintiff |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions106 days |
Filing LocationErie County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
|
Filing Court HouseErie County Supreme Court |
Case Cycle Time296 days |
JUDGMENT
Date: November 21, 2019STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: January 29, 2019SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: January 29, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 21, 2019 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT entered in the office of the County Clerk on November 21, 2019 | |
May 15, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION | |
May 15, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS | |
May 15, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR | |
May 15, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND PURCHASE OF ACCOUNT BY DEBT BUYER PLAINTIFF | |
May 15, 2019 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) SEA#295227 |
|
March 18, 2019 | Docket Event | COURT NOTICE | |
March 04, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
January 29, 2019 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | |
January 29, 2019 | Docket Event | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.