Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
Midland Funding Llc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Einstein, Stephen, Poulin, Anthony Scott, against Michele Heusinger, in the jurisdiction of Erie County. This case was filed in Erie County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJanuary 29, 2019 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Debt Buyer Plaintiff |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions63 days |
Filing LocationErie County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
|
Case Cycle Time92 days |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: January 29, 2019SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: January 29, 2019JUDGMENT
Date: May 01, 2019AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND PURCHASE OF ACCOUNT BY DEBT BUYER PLAINTIFF
Date: April 02, 2019SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT
Date: April 19, 2022AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR
Date: April 02, 2019AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS
Date: April 02, 2019JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)
Date: April 02, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 27, 2019SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT
Date: April 28, 2022COURT NOTICE
Date: March 11, 2019AFFIRMATION
Date: April 02, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 28, 2022 | SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT | ||
April 19, 2022 | SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT | ||
May 01, 2019 | JUDGMENT entered in the office of the County Clerk on May 01, 2019 | ||
April 02, 2019 | AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND PURCHASE OF ACCOUNT BY DEBT BUYER PLAINTIFF | ||
April 02, 2019 | AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR | ||
April 02, 2019 | AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS | ||
April 02, 2019 | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | ||
April 02, 2019 | AFFIRMATION | ||
March 11, 2019 | COURT NOTICE | ||
February 27, 2019 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.