Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
Oneida Fence Inc., filed a(n) Torts - Other (Restitution Judgment) case represented by White, Justin Stillwell, against Amber Maracle, in the jurisdiction of Erie County. This case was filed in Erie County Superior Courts Erie County Supreme Court with Joseph Glownia presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJanuary 29, 2019 |
CategoryTorts - Other (Restitution Judgment) |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
||
Filing LocationErie County, NY |
||
Filing Court HouseErie County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time248 days |
ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #001)
Date: October 03, 2019RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: January 29, 2019ORDER - SUMMARY JUDGMENT (Motion #001)
Date: October 04, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: January 29, 2019NOTICE OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT IN LIEU OF COMPLAINT (Motion #001)
Date: January 29, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 04, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER - SUMMARY JUDGMENT (Motion #001) | |
October 03, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #001) | |
March 01, 2019 | Hearing |
Granted (Motion #001) Part 6 Judge: Glownia, Hon. Joseph R. |
|
January 29, 2019 | Docket Event | RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION | |
January 29, 2019 | Motion |
Judgment - Summary in Lieu of Complaint (Motion #001) Decided: 03/01/2019Granted Before Justice: Glownia, Hon. Joseph R. Answer demanded: No Judge: Glownia, Hon. Joseph R. |
|
January 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 Judgment |
|
January 29, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT | |
January 29, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT IN LIEU OF COMPLAINT (Motion #001) | |
January 29, 2019 | Docket Event | SUMMONS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.