Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
Discover Bank, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Garbus, Mark A, Jordan, Tarah Eve, Leiderman, Joel D, Watts, Valerie Elizabeth, against James Krum, in the jurisdiction of Erie County. This case was filed in Erie County Superior Courts Erie County Supreme Court with Mark Grisanti presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 24, 2019 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationErie County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
Filing Court HouseErie County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: January 24, 2019STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: February 16, 2019NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) *Corrected*
Date: November 21, 2019ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #001)
Date: October 18, 2019RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) *Corrected*
Date: November 21, 2019JUDGMENT
Date: March 13, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 13, 2020 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT entered in the office of the County Clerk on March 13, 2020 | |
March 12, 2020 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION NON MIL |
|
March 12, 2020 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A DOD |
|
March 12, 2020 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED) Redacted |
|
March 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #001) NOTICE OF ENTRY |
|
February 24, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER - DEFAULT JUDGMENT (Motion #001) | |
February 20, 2020 | Hearing |
Granted (Motion #001)
Judge: Grisanti, Hon. Mark J. |
|
November 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) *Corrected* NOM COVER PAGE |
|
November 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) *Corrected* REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL INTERVENTION |
|
October 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #001) ORDER PROPOSED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.