Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
F James Mcguire, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Horn, John G, Mendolera, Lauren Renee, against The Mcguire Group, represented by Appelbaum, Michael Eric, Fryman, David J., Yeger, David, in the jurisdiction of Erie County. This case was filed in Erie County Superior Courts with Emilio Colaiacovo presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEmilio Colaiacovo Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 20, 2023 |
CategoryCommercial Division |
Last RefreshedJanuary 28, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationErie County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
EXHIBIT(S) Â - G
Date: January 12, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: January 12, 2024NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: January 12, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - F
Date: January 12, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: January 12, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: January 12, 2024AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: January 12, 2024INTERROGATORIES
Date: January 19, 2024MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT
Date: December 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 22, 2023NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: January 22, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: January 12, 2024MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT
Date: January 12, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - E
Date: January 12, 2024AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 22, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 22, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 22, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: October 30, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 22, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: December 08, 2023NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION
Date: July 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: January 20, 2023REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S)
Date: April 24, 2023RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: May 02, 2023STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: February 28, 2023COMPLAINT
Date: January 20, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 14, 2023ANSWER (AMENDED)
Date: April 03, 2023SUMMONS
Date: January 20, 2023ADDENDUM - COMMERCIAL DIVISION (840C)
Date: May 02, 2023RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: May 19, 2023NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION
Date: March 13, 2023ANSWER
Date: March 13, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: May 19, 2023ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING
Date: June 08, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 22, 2024 | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) | ||
January 19, 2024 | INTERROGATORIES | ||
January 12, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - G 1/4/24 Email |
||
January 12, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D Defendant's Objections and Responses |
||
January 12, 2024 | NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
January 12, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - F 12/11/23 Email |
||
January 12, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C Plaintiff's Document Requests |
||
January 12, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Summons and Complaint |
||
January 12, 2024 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION | ||
January 12, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B Answer to Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.