Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Barclays Bank Delaware, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Hunt, James T, Lubin, Jeffrey, Ruffin, Murianda L., Sussman, David Jeffrey, Tenaglia & Hunt, (total of 5) See All against Robert D Wurthmann, in the jurisdiction of Erie County. This case was filed in Erie County Superior Courts Erie County Supreme Court.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJanuary 15, 2019 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions380 days |
Filing LocationErie County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
|
Filing Court HouseErie County Supreme Court |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: January 15, 2019JUDGMENT
Date: February 20, 2020STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: March 04, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 20, 2020 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT entered in the office of the County Clerk on February 20, 2020 | |
January 30, 2020 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 Notice of Default |
|
January 30, 2020 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF SERVICE Invoice |
|
January 30, 2020 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service |
|
January 30, 2020 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Non Military | |
January 30, 2020 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS Affidavit of non expiration |
|
January 30, 2020 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Facts by original creditor | |
January 30, 2020 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) Judgment |
|
May 10, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
May 10, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.