Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, As Trustee For Ameriquest Mortgage Securities Inc., Asset-Backed Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2006-R1, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Boriskin, Sara Z., against Bank Of America, Na, Broadway Advance, Llc, Business Funding Source, John Doe 1-John Doe 12 The Last Twelve Names Being Fictitious And Unknown To Plaintiff,The Persons Or Parties Intended Being The Tenants, Occupants, Persons Or Corps, If Any, Having Or Claiming An Interest In Or Lien Upon The Premises, Described In The Complaint, New York State Department Of Taxation And Finance, (total of 7) See All represented by Brasky, Adam Michael, in the jurisdiction of Erie County. This case was filed in Erie County Superior Courts with Paula L Feroleto presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePaula L Feroleto Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 11, 2024 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedMarch 22, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationErie County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
This complaint is a foreclosure action filed by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company as the trustee for Ameriquest Mortgage Securities Inc. The defendants in the case are Valerie J. Klaskala, SJP Federal Credit Union, Broadway Advance LLC, Business F...
John Doe 1-John Doe 12 The Last Twelve Names Being Fictitious And Unknown To Plaintiff,The Persons Or Parties Intended Being The Tenants, Occupants, Persons Or Corps, If Any, Having Or Claiming An Interest In Or Lien Upon The Premises, Described In The Complaint
EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 04, 2024ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F)
Date: March 04, 2024RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 04, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 04, 2024AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 04, 2024STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: February 13, 2024ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 04, 2024NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 04, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 13, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 31, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 26, 2024NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: January 31, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 26, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 26, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 26, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 26, 2024STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: January 11, 2024STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: January 26, 2024NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: January 11, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 26, 2024CERTIFICATE OF MERIT
Date: January 11, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: January 11, 2024SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: January 11, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 04, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) PROOF OF MAILING |
||
March 04, 2024 | ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F) | ||
March 04, 2024 |
RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) RJI |
||
March 04, 2024 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001) AFFIRMATION OF SERVICE |
||
March 04, 2024 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001) AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF DISCONTINUANCE OF ACTION, CANCELLATION OF NOTICE PENDENCY |
||
March 04, 2024 |
ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #001) ORDER DISCONTINUING ACTION AND CANCELLING NOTICE OF PENDENCY |
||
March 04, 2024 |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) NOTICE OF MOTION TO DISCONTINUE THE ACTION AND TO CANCEL THE NOTICE OF PENDENCY |
||
February 13, 2024 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
February 13, 2024 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affirmation of Service- BUSINESS FUNDING SOURCE |
||
January 31, 2024 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Notice of Appearance and Waiver |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.