Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Michelle A. Barclay, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Mitchell, Ashley Victoria, against Sandra L. Johnston, represented by Eichen, Shayna Deborah, Victor, Sabrina Assayag, in the jurisdiction of Erie County, NY, . Erie County, NY Superior Courts with Dennis Ward presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDennis Ward Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 06, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedDecember 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationErie County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: January 06, 2021ANSWER
Date: February 08, 2021RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: September 10, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: September 10, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: August 18, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: November 26, 2021STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: March 21, 2022DEMAND FOR:
Date: November 10, 2021PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: January 26, 2021RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: February 08, 2021BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: September 10, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 26, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 21, 2022 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | ||
November 26, 2021 |
DEMAND FOR: IME Notice |
||
November 10, 2021 |
DEMAND FOR: Post Deposition Demand |
||
September 16, 2021 | Hearing |
Judge: Ward, Hon. Dennis |
|
September 10, 2021 | RESPONSE TO DEMAND | ||
September 10, 2021 |
DEMAND FOR: Notice to Produce |
||
September 10, 2021 | BILL OF PARTICULARS | ||
August 18, 2021 |
DEMAND FOR: Notice to Produce |
||
February 08, 2021 | ANSWER | ||
February 08, 2021 | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.