Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Stephanie L. Morse, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Desmond, Charles S., Glazer, Aaron Frederick, against Donna M. Krulisky, Lisa B. Cooper, represented by Durkin, Thomas P, Karambelkar, Aalok J., in the jurisdiction of Erie County. This case was filed in Erie County Superior Courts Erie County Supreme Court with Joseph Glownia presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 31, 2015 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationErie County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Filing Court HouseErie County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time424 days |
RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: December 07, 2016COMPLAINT
Date: December 31, 2015RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: May 20, 2016AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: January 05, 2017NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION
Date: November 23, 2016DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: January 21, 2016NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION
Date: January 21, 2016STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: February 27, 2017NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 05, 2017ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: January 21, 2016ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: February 22, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 27, 2017 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | |
January 10, 2017 | Hearing |
Settled Part 6 Judge: Glownia, Hon. Joseph R. |
|
January 05, 2017 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT | |
January 05, 2017 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) Summary Judgment |
|
January 05, 2017 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion #001) Note of Issue & Jury Demand |
|
January 05, 2017 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #001) Accident Report |
|
January 05, 2017 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #001) Photos |
|
January 05, 2017 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #001) Transcript |
|
January 05, 2017 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #001) Transcript |
|
January 05, 2017 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) Transcript |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.