Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case in the jurisdiction of Dutchess County. This case was filed in Dutchess County Superior Courts with Christine A. Sproat presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 21, 2015 |
CategoryTort-Other |
Last RefreshedOctober 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDutchess County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Case Cycle Time541 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 24, 2016 | Hearing |
Decided (Motion #003) Christine A. Sproat - Mtn MOTION (Conversion) Judge: Sproat, Hon. Christine A. |
|
June 24, 2016 | Hearing |
Decided (Motion #002) Christine A. Sproat - Mtn MOTION (Conversion) Judge: Sproat, Hon. Christine A. |
|
May 20, 2016 | Hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #002) Christine A. Sproat - Mtn MOTION (Conversion) Judge: Sproat, Hon. Christine A. |
|
May 20, 2016 | Motion |
Judgment - Summary (Motion #002) Decided: 06/24/2016Closed Before Justice: Sproat, Hon. Christine A. Answer demanded: No Judge: Sproat, Hon. Christine A. |
|
May 20, 2016 | Hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #003) Christine A. Sproat - Mtn MOTION (Conversion) Judge: Sproat, Hon. Christine A. |
|
May 20, 2016 | Motion |
Dismiss (Motion #003) Decided: 06/24/2016Closed Before Justice: Sproat, Hon. Christine A. Answer demanded: No Judge: Sproat, Hon. Christine A. |
|
May 13, 2016 | Hearing |
Settled Christine A. Sproat 9:30 SET L CONF., 5/20 MOT-11/28 J.S. (Conversion) Judge: Sproat, Hon. Christine A. |
|
April 22, 2016 | Hearing |
Adjourned Christine A. Sproat 9:30 STTLMT. CONF., 5/20-MOT;11/28/16 JS (Conversion) Judge: Sproat, Hon. Christine A. |
|
March 24, 2016 | Hearing |
Adjourned Christine A. Sproat 9:30 SET L CONF., 11/28/16 9:30 J.S. (Conversion) Judge: Sproat, Hon. Christine A. |
|
December 04, 2015 | Hearing |
Adjourned Christine A. Sproat 9:30 PTC/FINAL/N-I (Conversion) Judge: Sproat, Hon. Christine A. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.