Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case in the jurisdiction of Dutchess County. This case was filed in Dutchess County Superior Courts with Maria G. Rosa presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMaria G. Rosa Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 08, 2018 |
CategoryRp-Mortgage Foreclosure-Residential |
Last RefreshedNovember 07, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationDutchess County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Case Cycle Time119 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 07, 2018 | Hearing |
Hon. Maria G. Rosa JMT SIGNED (Conversion) Judge: Rosa, Hon. Maria G. |
|
May 04, 2018 | Motion |
(Motion #002) Decided: 05/07/2018Closed Before Justice: Rosa, Hon. Maria G. Answer demanded: No Judge: Rosa, Hon. Maria G. |
|
May 04, 2018 | Hearing |
Decided (Motion #002) Hon. Maria G. Rosa - Motions Judge: Rosa, Hon. Maria G. |
|
May 04, 2018 | Hearing |
Adjourned Hon. Maria G. Rosa MOTION, NO APPEARANCES (Conversion) Judge: Rosa, Hon. Maria G. |
|
April 20, 2018 | Hearing |
Adjourned Hon. Maria G. Rosa CONTROL, FOR JMT (Conversion) Judge: Rosa, Hon. Maria G. |
|
January 08, 2018 | Motion |
(Motion #001) Decided: 01/18/2018Closed Before Justice: Rosa, Hon. Maria G. Answer demanded: No Judge: Rosa, Hon. Maria G. |
|
January 08, 2018 | Hearing |
Decided (Motion #001) Hon. Maria G. Rosa - Motions Judge: Rosa, Hon. Maria G. |
|
January 08, 2018 | Hearing |
Adjourned Hon. Maria G. Rosa MOTION, NO APPEARANCES (Conversion) Judge: Rosa, Hon. Maria G. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.