Case Last Refreshed: 1 week ago
Inv. C. Gonyo, A Member Of The Nysp, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case represented by Bailey, Meg, against Giuseppe Vassallo, represented by Sanders, Jill Kathryn, in the jurisdiction of Dutchess County, NY, . Dutchess County, NY Superior Courts Supreme with Christi J. Acker presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 04, 2024 |
CategorySpecial Proceedings - Extreme Risk Protection Order |
Last RefreshedApril 23, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationDutchess County, NY |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Filing Court HouseSupreme |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 16, 2024 | Docket Event |
ORDER - EXTREME RISK PROTECTION ORDER (FINAL-GRANTED) *Corrected* Sealed |
|
April 16, 2024 | Docket Event |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Sealed |
|
April 16, 2024 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - OTHER Sealed |
|
March 29, 2024 | Docket Event |
ORDER - OTHER *Corrected* Sealed |
|
March 26, 2024 | Docket Event |
NOTIFICATION FROM COURT Sealed |
|
March 26, 2024 | Docket Event |
ORDER - EXTREME RISK PROTECTION ORDER (TEMPORARY-GRANTED) Sealed |
|
March 21, 2024 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI) Sealed |
|
March 12, 2024 | Docket Event |
ORDER - OTHER Sealed |
|
March 08, 2024 | Docket Event |
ORDER - OTHER Sealed |
|
March 08, 2024 | Docket Event |
ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Sealed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.