Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Edwin Luna, Glendy Guerra, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Deponto, Richard John, Mcmillan, Keith J., against Silo Ridge Property Ventures A, Llc, Silo Ridge Property Ventures B, Llc, Silo Ridge Ventures, Llc, Silo Ridge Ventures Single Family Property, Llc, Stoneleaf Construction, Llc, (total of 5) See All represented by Gitnik, Brian Stuart, Hofer, Danielle Lauren, Studley, Rikki Drew, in the jurisdiction of Dutchess County, NY, . Dutchess County, NY Superior Courts with Christi J Acker presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 02, 2023 |
CategoryTorts - Other Negligence (Premises Negligence) |
Last RefreshedJanuary 28, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDutchess County, NY |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
COURT NOTICE
Date: January 03, 2024ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: July 26, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: February 02, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: February 02, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 14, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 21, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 15, 2023ANSWER
Date: June 28, 2023PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ORDER (PROPOSED)
Date: June 29, 2023PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: June 27, 2023ANSWER
Date: June 15, 2023NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION
Date: June 27, 2023COMPLAINT (AMENDED)
Date: June 27, 2023SUMMONS-SUPPLEMENTAL (POST RJI)
Date: June 27, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: June 27, 2023RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: June 27, 2023COURT NOTICE
Date: July 21, 2023PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ORDER (PROPOSED)
Date: July 24, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 03, 2024 | COURT NOTICE | ||
July 26, 2023 | ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
July 24, 2023 |
PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ORDER (PROPOSED) proposed PC stip |
||
July 21, 2023 | COURT NOTICE | ||
June 29, 2023 | PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ORDER (PROPOSED) | ||
June 28, 2023 |
ANSWER Verified Answer to Amended Complaint, EBT Notice and Omnibus Demands |
||
June 27, 2023 | PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST | ||
June 27, 2023 | NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION | ||
June 27, 2023 | COMPLAINT (AMENDED) | ||
June 27, 2023 | SUMMONS-SUPPLEMENTAL (POST RJI) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.