Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
Jocatena Hargrove, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Sobo, Gregory Marc, against Brianna A. Vellone, Darian Jackson, represented by Mazzaro, Thomas Robert, in the jurisdiction of Dutchess County, NY, . Dutchess County, NY Superior Courts with Christi J Acker presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 21, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedJuly 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDutchess County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
COMPLAINT
Date: December 21, 2021ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: June 08, 2022PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ORDER (PROPOSED)
Date: May 18, 2022NOTICE OF PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: May 18, 2022ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: June 06, 2022BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: September 19, 2022COURT NOTICE
Date: July 28, 2022SUMMONS
Date: December 21, 2021RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: March 11, 2022ANSWER
Date: January 25, 2022DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: January 25, 2022PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: May 12, 2022RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: May 12, 2022RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: September 19, 2022RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: September 28, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 10, 2023ORDER - OTHER
Date: January 12, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 12, 2023 |
ORDER - OTHER SHORT FORM ORDER |
||
January 10, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
September 28, 2022 |
RESPONSE TO DEMAND Supplemental Response to PC Order |
||
September 19, 2022 |
BILL OF PARTICULARS Def Verified BP as to Affirmative Defenses |
||
September 19, 2022 |
RESPONSE TO DEMAND Response to PC Order |
||
July 28, 2022 | COURT NOTICE | ||
June 08, 2022 | ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
June 06, 2022 | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) | ||
May 18, 2022 | PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ORDER (PROPOSED) | ||
May 18, 2022 | NOTICE OF PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.