Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
Midland Credit Management, Inc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Slamowitz, Mitchell G, against Nick Lore, in the jurisdiction of Dutchess County, NY, . Dutchess County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 15, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Debt Buyer Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedJuly 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationDutchess County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 03, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: January 14, 2022JUDGMENT
Date: March 24, 2022AFFIRMATION
Date: January 14, 2022AFFIRMATION
Date: January 14, 2022SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: September 15, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: January 14, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: November 03, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: January 14, 2022JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)
Date: January 14, 2022202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING
Date: November 23, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 24, 2022 |
JUDGMENT As entered by County Clerk |
||
January 14, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT AOF |
||
January 14, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION MILITARY |
||
January 14, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION SIGNED PJTAFF |
||
January 14, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT SIGNED NON-SOL |
||
January 14, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A CLIENT STATEMENTS |
||
January 14, 2022 |
JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) SIGNED DEFAULT JUDGMENT |
||
November 23, 2021 |
202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING MAILED 11/23/21 |
||
November 03, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
November 03, 2021 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.