Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Norman, Paul, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Lincoln, Armando, in the jurisdiction of Napa County. This case was filed in Napa County Superior Courts with Monique S. Langhorne presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 18, 2006 |
CategorySmall Claims $1501 - $5000 |
Time To Trial67 days |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions67 days |
Filing LocationNapa County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time67 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 19, 2008 | Docket Event |
Writ (Filed) 714320-Writ: Filed Filed/Issued By: 912120 - Plaintiff Pro Per WRIT: FILED [714320] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By PLAINTIFF PRO PER [912120] |
|
March 20, 2008 | Docket Event |
Writ (Issued) 714310-Writ: Issued Filed/Issued By: 912120 - Plaintiff Pro Per WRIT: ISSUED [714310] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF [931210] |
|
February 23, 2007 | Docket Event |
Converted Stat Closure Disposition Date: Feb 23 2007 Type: 751110 - Judgment/Order Manner : 721110 - After Uncontested Hrg |
|
February 23, 2007 | Docket Event |
Declaration 713310-Declaration Filed/Issued By: DECLARATION [713310] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By |
|
February 23, 2007 | Docket Event |
Minute Order 713610-Minute Order Filed/Issued By: MINUTE ORDER [713610] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By |
|
February 23, 2007 | Docket Event |
Judgment: Notice of Entry (Small Claims) 714120-Judgment: Notice of Entry Filed/Issued By: JUDGMENT: NOTICE OF ENTRY [714120] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By |
|
February 23, 2007 | Docket Event |
Court Trial 711110-Hearing: Small Claims; Norman, P. vs. Lincoln, A. ; Judge: J21197 Langhorne Monique Judge: Langhorne, Monique |
|
January 04, 2007 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service 712310-Proof of Service Filed/Issued By: 923110 - Clerk PROOF OF SERVICE [712310] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By CLERK [923110] |
|
December 28, 2006 | Docket Event |
Receipt: Certified Mail 721260-Certified Mail Receipt Filed/Issued By: 923110 - Clerk CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT [721260] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By CLERK [923110] |
|
December 18, 2006 | Docket Event |
Statement 721110-Plaintiffs Statement to Clerk Filed/Issued By: 912120 - Plaintiff Pro Per PLAINTIFFS STATEMENT TO CLERK [721110] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By PLAINTIFF PRO PER [912120] |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.