Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Central Hudson Gas & Electric Corp., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Hunter, Robert Bruce, against North View Point Llc, in the jurisdiction of Dutchess County, NY, . Dutchess County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 27, 2021 |
CategoryCommercial - Contract |
Last RefreshedOctober 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationDutchess County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: May 27, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 15, 2021NOTICE
Date: November 10, 2021JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)
Date: August 11, 2021JUDGMENT
Date: August 12, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 10, 2021 |
NOTICE Transcript filed in Sullivan County on Oct 26 2021 |
||
August 12, 2021 |
JUDGMENT As entered by County Clerk |
||
August 11, 2021 | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | ||
June 15, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
May 27, 2021 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.